VA HB1047 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fingerprints and photographs by police authorities; reports to the Central Criminal Records Exchange. Provides that all duly constituted police authorities having the power of arrest may take the fingerprints and photographs of persons who plead guilty or are found guilty for driving while intoxicated when charged by summons. The bill also provides that such summons information may be entered into the Virginia Criminal Information Network. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Fingerprints and photographs by police authorities; reports to Central Criminal Records Exchange.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 91 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1047ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103894D |
Same As/Similar To
SB926 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)