VA HB1051 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Defense Force; Virginia National Guard; discipline. Clarifies that state active duty and training duty are subject to discipline and that the discipline is limited to nonjudicial punishment.
Title
Virginia Defense Force and Virginia National Guard; military discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 339 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1051ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100651D |