VA HB1064 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; establishment of neurobehavioral science unit; waiver services for individuals with traumatic brain injury and neurocognitive diagnoses; work group. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to seek authority through the state plan for medical assistance services to implement a neurobehavioral science unit and to submit an amendment to the state plan for medical assistance services to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to receive federal approval to administer neurorestorative and rehabilitative services for qualifying individuals with traumatic brain injury and neurocognitive diagnoses. The bill authorizes the Department to promulgate emergency regulations to implement the neurobehavioral science unit and the traumatic brain injury and neurocognitive diagnoses services waiver upon approval and directs the Department to convene a work group of relevant stakeholders to provide updates on the progress and the implementation of the neurobehavioral science unit and the traumatic brain injury and neurocognitive diagnoses services waiver.
Title
Neurobehavioral science unit; established, waiver services for individuals w/traumatic brain injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Incorporates HB593 (Sickles) |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106250D-H1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103386D |