VA HB1066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Signals; overtaking vehicle. Removes the requirement that the driver of an overtaking vehicle use his lights or an audible method to signal to the driver of a slower vehicle to move to the right. The bill does not change the requirement that the slower-moving vehicle move to the right for an overtaking vehicle.
Title
Driver of an overtaking vehicle; driver of an overtaken vehicle shall move to the right.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 815 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1066ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101984D-E |
2020-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1066E |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101984D |