VA HB1068 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; commercial and industrial property in localities in Northern Virginia. Extends the sunset date from June 30, 2013, to June 30, 2018, on the reduction in the tax rate for the special real property tax on commercial and industrial property in the localities encompassed by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority from 25 cents ($0.25) per $100 of assessed value to 12.5 cents ($0.125) per $100 of assessed value.
Title
Real estate tax; commercial and industrial property in localities in Northern Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1068ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1068H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105045D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105045D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103797D |