VA HB1070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Litter Control and Recycling Fund Advisory Board; membership. Increases membership on the Advisory Board from five to six persons, with the new member designated to represent the craft brewery industry.
Title
Litter Control and Recycling Fund Advisory Board; increases membership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14101367D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1070 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1070+hil |