VA HB1075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Poaching; revocation of hunting, trapping, or fishing license and privileges. Requires a court to revoke for a period of 12 months the hunting, trapping, or fishing license of any person convicted of taking, or attempting to take, any wild bird, wild animal, or fish during the closed season. The bill increases from five to 10 years the maximum period for which a court may revoke a hunting, trapping, or fishing license of any person convicted for violations or second violations of certain hunting, trapping, fishing, or firearms laws or Department of Game and Inland Fisheries regulations and also authorizes a court to revoke for one to 10 years a hunting, trapping, or fishing license for violations of certain additional hunting, trapping, or fishing laws.
Title
Poaching; revocation of hunting, trapping, or fishing license and privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (17-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101522D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 1 | 338 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 530.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |