VA HB1085 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; military students; enrollment. Requires any local school board of a school division in which a military installation or other military housing is located to establish and implement policies to provide for the enrollment to any school of any student residing on a military installation or in military housing within the school division, upon the request of his parent. The bill permits such policies to include certain conditions. The bill requires a copy of such policies to be posted on the division's website and to be available to the public upon request.
Title
Public schools; open enrollment for students residing on a military installation, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1085ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1085H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105883D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105883D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103450D |