VA HB1107 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; possession and administration of epinephrine. Requires local school boards to adopt and implement policies for the possession and administration of epinephrine in every school. The school nurse or a school board employee may administer the epinephrine to any student believed to be having an anaphylactic reaction. The bill also requires the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Department of Education and the Department of Health Professions to develop and implement policies for the recognition and treatment of anaphylaxis in the school setting.
Title
Public schools; possession and administration of auto-injectable epinephrine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1107ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1107ER) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1107H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105132D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105132D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103651D |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |