VA HB1119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local government powers; regulation of tobacco, nicotine, and hemp product retail sale locations. Permits localities to regulate by ordinance the location of retail sale locations established after July 1, 2024, that sell tobacco, nicotine, and hemp products. The bill provides that such ordinance may prohibit such retail sale locations within 1,000 linear feet of a public, private, or parochial school.
Title
Local government powers; regulation of tobacco, nicotine, and hemp product retail sale locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101788D |