VA HB1133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Candidate petitions in primaries and general elections. Provides that candidate petitions in primaries and general elections must be witnessed by a legal resident of the Commonwealth who attests that he is not a minor or a felon whose voting rights have not been restored. Current law requires that the petition witness must be eligible to vote for the office for which the petition is being circulated. The bill also provides that presidential candidates are eligible to witness their own petitions. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Candidate petitions for primaries and general elections; requirements for petition circulators.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective 4/4/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1133ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1133H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Emergency clause added | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104832D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104832D-H1 | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-12 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103364D |
Same As/Similar To
SB613 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)