VA HB1133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nondiscrimination in places of public accommodation; definitions. Nondiscrimination in places of public accommodation; definitions.
Title
Nondiscrimination in places of public accommodation, definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104393D |