VA HB1138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
County food and beverage tax; all counties may impose. Allows all counties to impose the local food and beverage tax without a referendum, provided the revenues from the tax are used to reduce the county's real property tax rate. The new provisions apply to those counties that impose the tax for the first time or increase the meals tax rate on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Food and beverage tax; all counties may impose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102517D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1138 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1138+hil |