VA HB1150 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Live or recorded threats over public airways or by other means; penalty. Clarifies that, for the offense of using profane, threatening, or indecent language over public airways or by other methods, "over any telephone" includes any electronically transmitted communication producing a recorded or live visual or electronic message that is received or transmitted by cellular telephone or other wireless telecommunications device.
Title
Live or recorded threats over public airways or by other means; penalty.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102723D |