VA HB1153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Benefits consortium for localities. Authorizes the governing bodies of three or more cities, counties, or school boards to form a benefits consortium for the purpose of establishing a self-funded employee welfare benefit plan. Under current law, such governing bodies or school boards are authorized to form such a benefits consortium if they comprised the membership of a multiple employer welfare arrangement as of December 31, 2014. Such a benefits consortium is required to be a nonstock corporation established to operate a benefits plan. Each member of the benefits consortium is contractually liable for its allocated share of the consortium's liabilities, and the benefits consortium is exempt from taxation and from insurance regulations.
Title
Benefits consortium; governing bodies of three or more cities, counties, or school boards to form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 48 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 51-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (48-Y 51-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103247D |