VA HB1169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; medical fees. Provides that the Workers' Compensation Commission shall retain jurisdiction for employees to pursue payment of charges for medical services notwithstanding that bills or parts of bills for health care services may have been paid by a source other than an employer, workers' compensation carrier, guaranty fund, or uninsured employer's fund.
Title
Workers' compensation; WCC shall retain jurisdiction for employees to pursue payment of charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1169ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-06 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1169H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104874D-H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104874D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2012-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104091D |