VA HB117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Net energy metering; solar interconnection; cost recovery. Provides that an electric distribution company shall pay 33 cents ($0.33) per kilowatt-hour per day for the costs of lost electricity production for any and all delays beyond the regulatory notice period required by the State Corporation Commission related to net energy metering. The bill requires that, for the purposes of net energy metering, an eligible customer-generator shall bear all reasonable costs of equipment required at the eligible customer-generator's premises for the interconnection to the supplier's electric distribution system, including commercially reasonable costs of additional controls, tests, or liability insurance. Additionally, the bill allows for cost recovery by Phase I and Phase II Utilities for electric distribution grid transformation projects that support the interconnection of generating facilities using energy derived from sunlight that are owned or contracted by eligible customer-generators, subject to the Commission finding those costs to be reasonable and prudent in accordance with existing law. Net energy metering; solar interconnection; cost recovery. Provides that an electric distribution company shall pay 33 cents ($0.33) per kilowatt-hour per day for the costs of lost electricity production for any and all delays beyond the regulatory notice period required by the State Corporation Commission related to net energy metering. The bill requires that, for the purposes of net energy metering, an eligible customer-generator shall bear all reasonable costs of equipment required at the eligible customer-generator's premises for the interconnection to the supplier's electric distribution system, including commercially reasonable costs of additional controls, tests, or liability insurance. Additionally, the bill allows for cost recovery by Phase I and Phase II Utilities for electric distribution grid transformation projects that support the interconnection of generating facilities using energy derived from sunlight that are owned or contracted by eligible customer-generators, subject to the Commission finding those costs to be reasonable and prudent in accordance with existing law.
Title
Net energy metering; solar interconnection, cost recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101754D |