VA HB1172 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; voter satellite offices; minimum number required. Requires that absentee voting in person be available in the office of the general registrar and in any voter satellite office that the governing body of any county or city chooses to establish. Localities with a population of 50,000 or more are required to establish at least one voter satellite office to be in operation for the duration of the period during which absentee voting in person is available. Under current law, the governing body of any county or city, regardless of its population, is authorized to establish as many voter satellite offices as it deems necessary.
Title
Absentee voting; voter satellite offices, minimum number required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1408-Srinivasan) by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101084D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |