VA HB1177 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; list maintenance; data sharing; requiring membership in the Electronic Registration Information Center (ERIC). Requires the Commissioner of Elections to apply for, enter into, and maintain membership for the Commonwealth in the Electronic Registration Information Center (ERIC).
Title
Voter registration; list maintenance, data sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1177ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100506D |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto