VA HB1182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Board for Professional Soil Scientists, Wetland Professionals, and Geologists; professional wetland delineator certification requirements. Replaces the requirement that an applicant with a bachelor's degree in a relevant field have four years of relevant experience to be certified as a professional wetland delineator with three years of such experience. For applicants seeking certification through experience, the bill reduces to three years the required experience that the applicant must have in wetland science research or as a teacher of wetlands curriculum in an accredited institution of higher education in order to be certified. Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Board for Professional Soil Scientists, Wetland Professionals, and Geologists; professional wetland delineator certification requirements. Replaces the requirement that an applicant with a bachelor's degree in a relevant field have four years of relevant experience to be certified as a professional wetland delineator with three years of such experience. For applicants seeking certification through experience, the bill reduces to three years the required experience that the applicant must have in wetland science research or as a teacher of wetlands curriculum in an accredited institution of higher education in order to be certified.
Title
Professional wetland delineator; certification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1182ER) |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1182H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107393D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107393D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102123D |