VA HB1188 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local board of social services; county board form of government. Allows counties that have adopted the county board form of government to appoint five rather than three members to the local board of social services.
Title
Social services, local board of; counties that have county board form of government to appoint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1188ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101238D |
Same As/Similar To
SB370 (Same As) 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)