VA HB1188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animal fighting. Prohibits wagering on the charging of admission for the participation in any event or exhibition at which a dog and either a coyote or a fox are placed into an enclosed area. A violation of the provisions of this bill is a Class 6 felony.
Title
Animal fighting; money paid for admission to certain premises, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104089D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1188 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1188+hil |