VA HB119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-29 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-29 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of handguns by members of the Virginia National Guard. Allows a member of the Virginia National Guard to possess a concealed handgun at National Guard facilities and facilities under contract with the National Guard if such member has a valid concealed handgun permit.
Title
Virginia National Guard; possession of handguns by members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB90-Taylor) by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2015-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100232D |
Same As/Similar To
HB90 (Similar To) 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB119 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB119+hil |