VA HB1197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Planning districts; King George County. Moves King George County from Planning District 16 (George Washington Regional Commission) to Planning District 17 (Northern Neck Planning District Commission). The bill requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to assist with this transition.
Title
Planning districts; King George County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103321D |
Same As/Similar To
SB371 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Continued to 2025 in Local Government (8-Y 7-N)