VA HB1206 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Obscene materials; restrictions on purchase, distribution, exhibition, or loan; exceptions; libraries and schools. Modifies the exceptions to restrictions on the purchase, distribution, exhibition, or loan of obscene materials by providing that schools supported by public appropriation are not subject to the exceptions and limiting the exception applicable to libraries supported by public appropriation only to obscene material that is available exclusively in a section of the library to which access is restricted by age.
Title
Obscene materials; modifies restrictions on purchase, distribution, exhibition, or loan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100176D |