VA HB121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; health education Standards of Learning; severe allergic reaction awareness training. Requires the Board of Education to include in the Standards of Learning for health education for grade nine and grade 10 an in-person or online severe allergic reaction awareness training that includes certain topics enumerated in the bill. The bill requires each school board to incorporate such severe allergic reaction awareness training into any health education instruction provided at grades nine and 10 beginning with the school year following the Board of Education's adoption of the revised Standards of Learning for health education for grades nine and 10 incorporating such severe allergic reaction awareness training and directs the Board to, in the intermediary time, develop and post on its website guidance documents for the purpose of making such severe allergic reaction awareness training available to school boards. Board of Education; health education Standards of Learning; severe allergic reaction awareness training. Requires the Board of Education to include in the Standards of Learning for health education for grade nine and grade 10 an in-person or online severe allergic reaction awareness training that includes certain topics enumerated in the bill. The bill requires each school board to incorporate such severe allergic reaction awareness training into any health education instruction provided at grades nine and 10 beginning with the school year following the Board of Education's adoption of the revised Standards of Learning for health education for grades nine and 10 incorporating such severe allergic reaction awareness training and directs the Board to, in the intermediary time, develop and post on its website guidance documents for the purpose of making such severe allergic reaction awareness training available to school boards.
Title
SOL; includes severe allergic reaction awareness training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB121ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107846D-S1 (97-T 2-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB121S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107846D-S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107846D-S1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB121H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106350D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106350D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2024-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102307D |