VA HB1212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Visitors of Norfolk State University; authority. Authorizes the Visitors of Norfolk State University, with the approval of the Governor first obtained, to lease real estate to which the University has acquired title by gift, devise or purchase.
Title
Norfolk State University, Visitors of; with approval of Governor, to lease titled real estate.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Alexander [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10100202D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1212 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1212+hil |