VA HB1212 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Political contributions and gifts; prohibition in connection with the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund. Provides that the Governor, his campaign committee, and any political action committee established on his behalf shall not knowingly solicit or accept a contribution, gift, or other item with a value greater than $50 from persons and entities seeking loans or grants from the Fund. The bill also restricts such gifts and contributions from persons and entities seeking loans or grants from the Fund. The bill provides that any violation shall result in a civil penalty of $500 or up to two times the amount of the contribution or gift, whichever is greater.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; political contributions and gifts, prohibited conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (21-Y 75-N) (Y: 21 N: 77 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (21-Y 75-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2, 3 and 4 (21-Y 75-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | Speaker ruled Governor's amendments # 5, 6, 7 and 8 not germane |
2014-04-23 | House | Speaker ruled Governor's amendment #9 not germane |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1212ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1212H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104684D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104684D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103849D |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor