VA HB1212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship and conservatorship; notice of hearing. Requires the notice of hearing for a guardianship or conservatorship petition to include a notice that any adult individual or entity whose name and post office address appears in the initial petition for appointment may become a party to the action by filing a pleading with the circuit court in which the guardianship or conservatorship proceeding is pending. Guardianship and conservatorship; notice of hearing. Requires the notice of hearing for a guardianship or conservatorship petition to include a notice that any adult individual or entity whose name and post office address appears in the initial petition for appointment may become a party to the action by filing a pleading with the circuit court in which the guardianship or conservatorship proceeding is pending.
Title
Guardianship and conservatorship; notice of hearing, cross-petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1212ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1212H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105682D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105682D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22101034D |