VA HB1219 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; powers and duties with respect to polygraph examiners. Clarifies the authority of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation with respect to the polygraph examiners regulatory program to (i) charge fees for issuing licenses and renewals, (ii) conduct investigations, (iii) enter into consent agreements related to investigations and disciplinary proceedings, and (iv) impose monetary penalties. In doing so the bill conforms the powers and duties of the agency for the polygraph examiners regulatory program to the powers and duties for other regulatory programs that it administers.
Title
Polygraph examiners; Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to regulate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1219ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-14 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-14 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103734D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1802.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |