VA HB1229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Manufactured home parks; sale of park; notice; rights of association. Entitles a manufactured home park association, as defined in the bill, to make a bona fide offer to purchase the park in a situation where a landlord has given the required written notice of termination of rental agreements due to plans for rehabilitation or a change in the use of all or any part of a manufactured home park by the landlord. The bill provides certain requirements for negotiations between the landlord and the association.
Title
Manufactured home parks; sale of park, notice, rights of association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1249-Torian) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101782D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1249 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1229 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1229+hil |