VA HB1230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conducting charitable gaming; location requirement. Removes the requirement, with regard to the sale of instant bingo, pull tabs, or seal cards and the conduct of bingo games, that a qualified organization conduct such forms of charitable gaming in the county, city, or town in which its principal office, as registered with the State Corporation Commission, is located or in an adjoining county, city, or town.
Title
Conducting charitable gaming; location requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104283D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.26:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |