VA HB1231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; communication to local school boards; JROTC; legal obligations. Requires the Department of Education to notify each school board of any obligation imposed on the school board or any public school in the local school division pursuant to any federal law or regulation relating to student eligibility to participate in Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps (JROTC) programs offered by any branch of the Armed Forces of the United States in public schools. Department of Education; communication to local school boards; JROTC; legal obligations. Requires the Department of Education to notify each school board of any obligation imposed on the school board or any public school in the local school division pursuant to any federal law or regulation relating to student eligibility to participate in Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps (JROTC) programs offered by any branch of the Armed Forces of the United States in public schools.
Title
JROTC; DOE to notify school boards of any federal legal obligation to participate in program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1231ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1231H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107359D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107359D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103434D |