VA HB1232 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Security freezes; fees. Prohibits a credit reporting agency from requiring a consumer to pay a fee to place a security freeze on the consumer's credit report if the consumer has not previously requested the placement of a security freeze from the consumer reporting agency. Currently, a consumer may be required to pay a fee of no more than $10 to place a security freeze on his credit report. The measure does not prohibit a consumer reporting agency from charging a fee to temporarily lift or to remove a security freeze or to place a security freeze on the consumer's credit report if it is the second or subsequent request for placement of a security freeze. Victims of identity theft are currently exempt from the fee.
Title
Security freezes; fees.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103665D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 444.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 444.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |