VA HB1236 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local government actions related to comprehensive plans, local planning commissions, subdivision plats and site plans, and zoning ordinances; approval process. Makes several changes to local government land use approval processes, including (i) prohibiting use of the comprehensive plan as the basis, in whole or in part, for the disapproval of a site plan that is otherwise in conformity with duly adopted standards, ordinances, and statutes and (ii) allowing automatic approval of certain land use applications rather than a right to petition the circuit court, as provided under current law, if a locality does not approve or disapprove the application within the required timeframe. The bill also reduces from 12 months to four months the time within which a locality must initially act upon certain proposed zoning ordinance amendments and requires a locality to act on all such proposed amendments to the zoning ordinance or map that it has previously disapproved within 45 days after an amended proposal has been resubmitted for approval.
Title
Local government actions related to comprehensive plans, etc.; approval process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103108D |
Same As/Similar To
SB721 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Continued to 2025 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2259 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2260.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |