VA HB1237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development incentive rates. Requires certain incumbent electric utilities to offer electric service at an economic development incentive rate to certain nonresidential customers. To be eligible for an economic development incentive rate, a customer shall have a new load of at least 1,000 KW and either increase employment by at least 75 full-time equivalent employees per 1,000 KW of new load or make a capital investment of $400,000 per 1,000 KW of new load. An economic development incentive rate provides eligible customers the option of either (i) a monthly credit of $6 per KW for three years or (ii) a monthly credit of $6 per KW for the first year, reduced by $0.75 per KW in each of the following years of an eight-year term.
Title
Economic development incentive rates; electric utilities to offer service to certain customers.
Sponsors
Del. Ward Armstrong [D] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. Clarence Phillips [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (12-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2010-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103841D |