VA HB1237 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting on Sundays. Allows hunting on Sundays under certain circumstances. A person may hunt waterfowl, subject to restrictions imposed by the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries, and a landowner and his immediate family or a person with written permission from the landowner may hunt or kill any wild bird or wild animal, including nuisance species, on the landowner's property. However, the aforementioned hunting activities cannot occur within 200 yards of a house of worship. The bill prohibits the hunting of deer or bear with a gun, firearm, or other weapon with the aid or assistance of dogs on Sunday.
Title
Wild animals & birds; unlawful to hunt on private property and state waters on Sunday, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 152 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1237ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (71-Y 27-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102270D-E |
2014-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1237E |
2014-01-27 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-01-27 | House | Amendment by Delegate Gilbert agreed to |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee amendment rejected |
2014-01-27 | House | Substitute by Delegate Fariss rejected 14104488D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104488D-H1 (Fariss) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 10-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14102270D |
Same As/Similar To
SB154 (Same As) 2014-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)