VA HB1240 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Summary
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; access of tenant to cable, satellite and other television facilities. Authorizes a landlord of a manufactured housing community to enter into a service agreement with a television service provider to provide marketing and other services to the television service provider and to receive compensation for the services. Compensation under such service agreement may also include the reasonable value of the landlord's property that is used by the television service provider. This is similar to the authorization provided to a landlord under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act.
Title
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act.; access of tenant to cable, satellite, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1240ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 089827712-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1240E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Assigned GL sub: Housing | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089827712 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1240 |