VA HB1240 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of nicotine vapor product, alternative nicotine product, hemp product intended for smoking, or tobacco product; civil penalties. Increases the civil penalties for the sale, distribution, purchase for, or permitting of the purchase by persons less than 21 years of age and the sale to an individual who does not demonstrate he is at least 21 years of age of any nicotine vapor product, alternative nicotine product, hemp product intended for smoking, or tobacco product other than a bidi from $100 to $500 for a first violation, from $200 to $1,000 for a second violation, and from $500 to $2,500 for a third or subsequent violation.
Title
Sale of nicotine vapor product, alternative nicotine product, etc.; increases civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1090-Oates) by voice vote |
2024-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102512D |