VA HB1245 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase or transportation of firearm by persons convicted of certain drug offenses. Provides that any person who has been convicted of two misdemeanor offenses for possession of synthetic cannabinoids, marijuana, or controlled substances within a 36-month period is prohibited from purchasing or transporting a firearm. Currently, the prohibition only applies to handguns.
Title
Firearms; purchase or transportation by persons convicted of certain drug offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103856D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1245 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1245+hil |