VA HB1263 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Abolition of juvenile fines and fees; criminal offenses. Abolishes court costs, fines, and fees assessed to a juvenile or his parent or other persons responsible for his care in circuit court and juvenile and domestic relations district court related to prosecutions of criminal offenses. Abolition of juvenile fines and fees; criminal offenses. Abolishes court costs, fines, and fees assessed to a juvenile or his parent or other persons responsible for his care in circuit court and juvenile and domestic relations district court related to prosecutions of criminal offenses.
Title
Abolition of juvenile fines and fees; criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107892D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104906D-E |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1263E |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104906D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1263 (Carry Over) 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
SB481 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
SB481 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Juveniles
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Juveniles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 266 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 267 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 273 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 290.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 298 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 330.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 246.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 159 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 383 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 808.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |