VA HB1277 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care; background checks. Allows applicants for employment and applicants to serve as volunteers to work in certain child day centers, family day homes, and family day systems pending the results of a full background check, provided that (i) the applicant has received qualifying results on a fingerprint-based background check through the Central Criminal Records Exchange or the Federal Bureau of Investigation and (ii) the applicant is supervised at all times by a person who received a qualifying result on a full background check within the past five years. Child care; background checks. Allows applicants for employment and applicants to serve as volunteers to work in certain child day centers, family day homes, and family day systems pending the results of a full background check, provided that (i) the applicant has received qualifying results on a fingerprint-based background check through the Central Criminal Records Exchange or the Federal Bureau of Investigation and (ii) the applicant is supervised at all times by a person who received a qualifying result on a full background check within the past five years.
Title
Child care; background checks.
Sponsors
Del. Amy Laufer [D] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] |
Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1277ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1277H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106132D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106132D-H1 |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102756D |