VA HB1286 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restrictions on issuance of process of arrest by a magistrate. Provides that a magistrate may not issue an arrest warrant for a felony offense upon the basis of a complaint by a person other than a law-enforcement officer without prior authorization by the attorney for the Commonwealth or, if no attorney for the Commonwealth is available, without prior authorization by a law-enforcement agency having jurisdiction over the alleged offense. Current law requires only consultation with the attorney for the Commonwealth or, if he is unavailable, consultation with the law-enforcement agency.
Title
Magistrate; may issue arrest warrants for a felony only if complaint by law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Del. Robin Abbott [D] | Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Paula Miller [D] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104087D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1286 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1286+hil |