VA HB1309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board; guidelines for the provision of emergency treatment of fire, police, and search and rescue dogs. Requires the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board, in consultation with the Board of Veterinary Medicine, to develop guidelines and guidance for the provision of emergency treatment of fire, police, and search and rescue dogs injured in the line of duty and the transportation of such dogs by an emergency medical services vehicle to a veterinary care facility equipped to provide emergency treatment to such dog. State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board; guidelines for the provision of emergency treatment of fire, police, and search and rescue dogs. Requires the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board, in consultation with the Board of Veterinary Medicine, to develop guidelines and guidance for the provision of emergency treatment of fire, police, and search and rescue dogs injured in the line of duty and the transportation of such dogs by an emergency medical services vehicle to a veterinary care facility equipped to provide emergency treatment to such dog.
Title
St. Emerg. Medical Services Advisory Bd.; guidelines for provision of emerg. trtmt. of police dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1309ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104689D-E |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1309E |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104689D |