VA HB1313 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prince William County Metro Rail Improvement District. Creates the Prince William County Metro Rail Improvement District to provide a means of financing an extension of commuter rail service from Fairfax County into Prince William County.
Title
Prince William County Metro Rail Improvement District; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Appropriations by voice vote | |
2010-02-12 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-02-11 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation | |
2010-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104880D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-31 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103756D |