VA HB1318 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; liquefied propane gas containers. Exempts stationary American Society of Mechanical Engineers (ASME) LP-Gas containers used exclusively in propane service from the Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act if their capacity does not exceed 2,000 gallons and the owner or his servicing agent inspects the tank every five years, maintains records of the inspection, and makes the records available to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry. The measure also provides that boilers and pressure vessels on the property of private residences and apartment houses with fewer than four units are exempt from the Act; the current exemption applies only to such equipment in such residences or apartment houses.
Title
Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; certain liquefied propane gas containers exempt from Act.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1318ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2012-10-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-10-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100278D |