VA HB1318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probation violation guidelines; use of sentencing revocation report and discretionary sentencing guidelines in revocation proceedings. Authorizes the Virginia Sentencing Commission to develop, maintain, and modify a system of statewide discretionary sentencing guidelines for use in hearings conducted in circuit courts in which the defendant is cited for violation of a condition or conditions of supervised probation imposed as a result of a felony conviction. The bill provides that a court would be presented with such guidelines when a defendant is cited for violating a condition or conditions of supervised probation imposed as a result of a felony conviction and such person is under the supervision of a state probation and parole officer.
Title
Probation violation guidelines; use of sentencing revocation report and discretionary sentencing.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1318ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104419D |
Same As/Similar To
SB424 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
SB424 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
SB424 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |