VA HB1330 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Summary
Economic development grants; aerospace engine manufacturing. Establishes three grant programs relating to aerospace engine manufacturing. Grants would be paid to manufacturers of aerospace engines who (i) make a capital investment of at least $500 million in real and personal property and (ii) create in excess of 540 jobs relating to aerospace engine manufacturing or activities ancillary or supportive of such manufacturing. Under this grant program, a maximum of $35 million in grants would be paid beginning in the 2013-2014 fiscal year and ending in the 2022-2023 fiscal year. A second grant program would provide training grants in the amount of $9,000 for each new job created by a manufacturer of aerospace engines or an affiliate thereof. Training grants would not exceed $5,778,000 in total. In addition, a supplemental training grant in the amount of $3 million would be paid to an aerospace engine manufacturer who has invested at least $153.9 million in real and personal property and has hired at least 176 new employees. A final grant program would provide up to $5 million in grants to an aerospace engine manufacturer who attracts certain suppliers to locate or expand operations in the Commonwealth. Under this grant program, in order for the aerospace engine manufacturer to be paid the full $5 million in grants, such suppliers would be required to create at least 300 jobs and make a capital investment of at least $50 million.
Title
Aerospace Engine Manufacturing Performance Grant Program; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1330ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1330H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 082945696-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 082945696-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082877812 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1330 |