VA HB1350 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mathematics assessments; targeted remediation and intervention for computational deficiencies. Requires local school divisions to provide targeted mathematics remediation and intervention to students in grades six through eight who show computational deficiencies on any diagnostic or grade-level Standards of Learning mathematics test that measures non-calculator computational skills.
Title
Standards of Learning; local school divisions shall provide math remediation, etc., for grades 6-8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1350ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1350ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104374D-EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1350EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Motion to refer to Appropriations committee rejected |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Albo agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104374D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104374D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2012-11-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100704D |