VA HB1350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal injury or wrongful death action; appointment of administrator. Imposes a minimum interval of 60 days between a person's death and a circuit court clerk's appointment of an administrator for prosecution of a personal injury or wrongful death action against or on behalf of the decedent, when an executor or administrator of the estate has not been appointed.
Title
Personal injury or wrongful death; appointment of an administrator for prosecution of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 124 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1350ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100061D |